Global Patent Index - EP 1025573 A1

EP 1025573 A1 2000-08-09 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A RELAY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A RELAY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RELAIS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN RELAIS

Publication

EP 1025573 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955329 A

Priority

  • DE 9802729 W
  • DE 19747166 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922392A1] A coil form (1) is injection moulded to form the base body of the relay. At least one fixed contact carrier (3,4), one contact-spring contact pin (5) and coil contact pins (9,10) embodied as wire sections in the form of drawn semi-finished products are introduced into the mould and extrusion-coated. The core (16) can also be embedded into the material of the coil form (1) if so desired. This dispenses with assembly processes involving the abrasion of plastic particles which can later become deposited on the contacts. All connector pieces can be mounted in a cost-effective manner in the injection mould, requiring as little material as possible by virtue of the fact that there is no wastage when the semi-finished wires are separated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 49/00; H01H 50/04; H01H 50/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 49/00 (2006.01); H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/14 (2006.01); H01H 50/44 (2006.01); H01H 50/54 (2006.01); H01H 11/06 (2006.01); H01H 50/26 (2006.01); H01H 50/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 49/00 (2013.01); H01H 50/042 (2013.01); H01H 50/14 (2013.01); H01H 11/06 (2013.01); H01H 50/26 (2013.01); H01H 50/36 (2013.01); H01H 50/443 (2013.01); H01H 50/54 (2013.01); H01H 2011/0087 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4902 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922392A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9922392 A1 19990506; AR 009912 A1 20000503; AT 216128 T 20020415; BR 9813093 A 20000822; CA 2306787 A1 19990506; CA 2306787 C 20061114; CN 1146935 C 20040421; CN 1277730 A 20001220; DE 19747166 C1 19990602; EP 1025573 A1 20000809; EP 1025573 B1 20020410; ES 2173639 T3 20021016; JP 2001521272 A 20011106; TW 385464 B 20000321; US 6266867 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-12-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2008-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2173639

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803777

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-16

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2002-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 216128

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT