Global patent index - EP 1025574 A1

EP 1025574 A1 2000-08-09 - ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES RELAIS

Title (fr)

RELAIS ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1025574 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951232 A

Priority

  • DE 9802544 W
  • DE 19747167 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19747167C1] An electromagnetic relay including a coil-former (1) with a winding tube (11) having two flanges (12,13) with one winding (2). A first flange (12) forms a switching space (14) and within the coil-tube (11), an axial core (16) forms a pole surface facing the switching space (14) and is joined to an L-shaped yoke (20) in the region of the second flange (13). A yoke (20) forms with its free-end in the region of the switching-space (14), a vertical mounting edge (21) for a flat armature (22), and in the region of the movable end of the armature is at least one fixed contact carrier (3) in the coil- former (1). A contact spring (23;33) formed from flat strip material, is joined to the armature (22) and carries a movable contact (25) on its free-end (23a), and is joined to the contact- spring terminal-pin (5) of the relay. The contact-spring terminal-pin and at least one fixed contact carrier (3,4), consisting of drawn or rolled wire, are embedded in the coil- former (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/24 (2006.01); H01H 49/00 (2006.01); H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/14 (2006.01); H01H 50/44 (2006.01); H01H 50/54 (2006.01); H01H 50/26 (2006.01); H01H 50/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/14 (2013.01); H01H 49/00 (2013.01); H01H 50/042 (2013.01); H01H 50/26 (2013.01); H01H 50/36 (2013.01); H01H 50/443 (2013.01); H01H 50/54 (2013.01); H01H 2050/049 (2013.01); H01H 2050/446 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922393A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19747167 C1 19990429; AR 009699 A1 20000426; AT 214515 T 20020315; BR 9814613 A 20001003; CA 2309134 A1 19990506; CA 2309134 C 20070529; CN 1129933 C 20031203; CN 1273688 A 20001115; EP 1025574 A1 20000809; EP 1025574 B1 20020313; ES 2172219 T3 20020916; JP 2001521273 A 20011106; JP 4100658 B2 20080611; TW 388900 B 20000501; US 6225880 B1 20010501; WO 9922393 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100829

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100828

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100828

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100828

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100828

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090803

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090826

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090817

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172219

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-06-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-06-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803368

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI

2002-03-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 214515

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-04-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000513

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI