Global patent index - EP 1025604 A1

EP 1025604 A1 2000-08-09 - PRODUCING ELECTRICAL ENERGY FROM NATURAL GAS USING A SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL

Title (en)

PRODUCING ELECTRICAL ENERGY FROM NATURAL GAS USING A SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL

Title (de)

PRODUKTION ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE AUS ERDGAS IN FESTOXIDBRENNSTOFFZELLEN

Title (fr)

PRODUCTION D'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE A PARTIR DE GAZ NATUREL AU MOYEN D'UNE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE OXYDE SOLIDE

Publication

EP 1025604 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98947473 A

Priority

  • EP 98947473 A
  • EP 9805476 W
  • EP 97306484 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910945A1] A process of generating electricity from natural gas (1) comprises supplying air (37) to the cathode side (20) of a solid oxide fuel cell (10); converting at the anode side (15) of the fuel cell the natural gas to hydrogen and carbon monoxide and allowing the cathode and anode reactions to take place to produce a potential difference betweem anode and cathode wherein an anode off-gas is produced which comprises water and carbon dioxide and feeding the anode off-gas from the anode side (15) to a ceramic afterburner (75) in which any unburned carbon monoxide and hydrogen are combusted without addition of nitrogen to the anode off-gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 8/12; H01M 8/04; H01M 8/06; E21B 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/24 (2006.01); E21B 43/16 (2006.01); H01M 8/04 (2006.01); H01M 8/06 (2006.01); H01M 8/12 (2006.01); H01M 8/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/0625 (2013.01); E21B 43/164 (2013.01); H01M 8/04089 (2013.01); H01M 8/0662 (2013.01); H01M 8/1231 (2016.02); H01M 8/04022 (2013.01); H01M 8/04119 (2013.01); H01M 8/243 (2013.01); H01M 2008/1293 (2013.01); H01M 2300/0074 (2013.01); Y02E 60/525 (2013.01); Y02P 70/56 (2015.11); Y02P 90/70 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910945 A1 19990304; AR 013436 A1 20001227; AU 725897 B2 20001026; AU 9437998 A 19990316; BR 9811366 A 20000822; CA 2299695 A1 19990304; CA 2299695 C 20070703; CN 1127160 C 20031105; CN 1268255 A 20000927; DE 69802433 D1 20011213; DE 69802433 T2 20020627; DK 1025604 T3 20020107; EG 21607 A 20011231; EP 1025604 A1 20000809; EP 1025604 B1 20011107; ES 2169557 T3 20020701; ID 23522 A 20000427; JP 2001514438 A 20010911; JP 4081238 B2 20080423; MY 119802 A 20050729; NO 20000936 A 20000225; NO 20000936 D0 20000225; NO 323025 B1 20061227; NZ 502593 A 20010928; PE 110299 A1 19991125; RU 2199172 C2 20030220; US 6432565 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150824

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-05-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150824

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69802433

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140809

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070824

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060825

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060825

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-03-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050816

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2169557

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-01-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69802433

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-13

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL