Global Patent Index - EP 1025702 B9

EP 1025702 B9 2007-10-03 - RAIN SENSOR WITH FOG DISCRIMINATION

Title (en)

RAIN SENSOR WITH FOG DISCRIMINATION

Title (de)

REGENSENSOR MIT NEBELERKENNUNG

Title (fr)

DETECTEUR DE PLUIE DISTINGUANT LA PLUIE DE LA BUEE

Publication

EP 1025702 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 98956367 A

Priority

  • US 9823062 W
  • US 6433597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923828A1] A vehicle rain sensor system for detecting precipitation on an exterior surface of a window (19) including an illumination sensor (36) that is decoupled from the window. The illumination sensor is preferably an imaging array sensor which communicates a signal control (42) which further determines whether rain is present on the window. The control preferably includes an edge detection (44) for detecting edges of precipitation droplets on the window and activating the windshield wipers (22) of the vehicle when the number of edges detected exceeds a predetermined threshold value. The rain sensor system may further include a polarizing filter (62) and an illumination source (55), such that rain sensor system may not only prevent false signals of rain when only fog is present on an interior surface (28) on the window, but also allows the rains sensor system to actually detect fog particles on an interior surface on the window, thereby allowing the control to further be connected to a ventilation blower within the vehicle for the purpose of activating the blower to eliminate the fog.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/18 (2006.01); B60N 2/00 (2006.01); B60Q 1/08 (2006.01); B60S 1/08 (2006.01); B60R 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/00785 (2013.01); B60N 2/002 (2013.01); B60S 1/0822 (2013.01); B60S 1/0844 (2013.01); B60S 1/0888 (2013.01); G06K 9/00791 (2013.01); B60R 2001/1223 (2013.01); B60S 1/0833 (2013.01); B60S 1/0837 (2013.01); B60S 1/0885 (2013.01); Y10S 318/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923828 A1 19990514; AU 1290599 A 19990524; DE 69836344 D1 20061214; DE 69836344 T2 20070531; EP 1025702 A1 20000809; EP 1025702 A4 20030312; EP 1025702 B1 20061102; EP 1025702 B9 20071003; US 2002121972 A1 20020905; US 6353392 B1 20020305; US 6768422 B2 20040727

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69836344

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111030

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111030

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070213

2007-02-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070202

2006-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69836344 P 20061214

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2006-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHOFIELD, KENNETH

2006-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LARSON, MARK, L.

2006-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOS, BRENT, J.

2006-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LYNAM, NIALL, R.

2003-03-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-01-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04N 7/18 A, 7B 60S 1/08 B

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE