Global Patent Index - EP 1025739 A2

EP 1025739 A2 2000-08-09 - GENERATION OF A SEED NUMBER

Title (en)

GENERATION OF A SEED NUMBER

Title (de)

GENERATION EINER STARTNUMMER

Title (fr)

GENERATION D'UNE VALEUR DE DEPART

Publication

EP 1025739 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98958929 A

Priority

  • FI 9800879 W
  • FI 974198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925086A2] Method for computing the key to an encryption algorithm used to encrypt messages to be transmitted over a telecommunication network and for generating the seed number needed for the computation of the encryption key. According to the invention, the seed number used is a number computed from a random number generated by the authentication centre of the mobile communication network, and the encryption key is computed using the authentication algorithm from the seed number and a subscriber identification key.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38; H04L 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 9/08 (2006.01); H04W 12/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 12/04 (2013.01); H04L 63/062 (2013.01); H04W 12/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925086 A2 19990520; WO 9925086 A3 19991028; AU 1489299 A 19990531; CA 2309666 A1 19990520; EP 1025739 A2 20000809; FI 105253 B 20000630; FI 974198 A0 19971111; FI 974198 A 19990512; JP 2001523064 A 20011120; NZ 504378 A 20020328

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [REG NL ZD] CORRECTIONS TO EARLIER PUBLICATIONS

- Free text: PAT. BUL. 11/2005 HEADING PD, SECTION 4, PAGE 1685, INT.CL. A42B 1/24, PATENT NO. 1025739; THE NAME OF THE INVENTOR SHOULD READ: HERMAN JACQUES MONSHOUWER TE AMÜUR BANGLAMUNG (TH).

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2000-10-11 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000504;LV PAYMENT 20000504

2000-08-16 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000504

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE