Global Patent Index - EP 1025746 B1

EP 1025746 B1 2002-09-04 - CIRCUIT FOR OPERATING AT LEAST TWO DISCHARGE LAMPS

Title (en)

CIRCUIT FOR OPERATING AT LEAST TWO DISCHARGE LAMPS

Title (de)

SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM BETRIEB VON MINDESTENS ZWEI ENTLADUNGSLAMPEN

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER AU MOINS DEUX LAMPES A DECHARGE

Publication

EP 1025746 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924760 A

Priority

  • DE 9901010 W
  • DE 19837728 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19837728A1] The circuit has a half bridge rectifier (Q10,Q11) with at least one load circuit (L1,C10,LP1) connected to it. At least one coupling capacitor (C11) is connected to the load circuit and half bridge rectifier. There is a rectifier drive arrangement (A1) and load circuit connections for at least one discharge lamp (LP1). A detector circuit (DE1) compares the voltage drop at the coupling capacitors or the voltage drop divided by a potential divider with a reference voltage and generates an output signal for driving the rectifier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/298

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/24 (2006.01); H05B 41/298 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2985 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19837728 A1 20000224; AT 223638 T 20020915; CA 2306815 A1 20000302; EP 1025746 A1 20000809; EP 1025746 B1 20020904; JP 2002523888 A 20020730; JP 4315598 B2 20090819; US 6288500 B1 20010911; WO 0011916 A1 20000302

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150401

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59902543

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59902543

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 223638 T

- Effective date: 20120401

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-11-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121101

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59902543

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110422

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110309

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110412

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902543 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223638 T 20020915

2002-01-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CIRCUIT FOR OPERATING AT LEAST TWO DISCHARGE LAMPS

2002-01-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CIRCUIT FOR OPERATING AT LEAST TWO DISCHARGE LAMPS

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT NL SE