Global Patent Index - EP 1025766 A1

EP 1025766 A1 2000-08-09 - Elastic interlining, method for making it and its use

Title (en)

Elastic interlining, method for making it and its use

Title (de)

Elastische Einlage, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Verwendung

Title (fr)

Entoilage élastique, procédé pour sa fabrication et son utilisation

Publication

EP 1025766 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99101614 A

Priority

EP 99101614 A

Abstract (en)

The elastic fusible interlining material is a woven or knitted fabric or a woven with an added weft insert. A filament yarn is used for the warps and/or wefts, and an adhesive coating is applied to one surface. The uncoated surface is roughened. The filament yarns have a thickness of 15-440 dtex or 30-180 dtex. They are additionally twisted at a rate of 20-1000 twists/m or 100-400 twists/m. An Independent claim is included for a mfg. process where the fabric is woven or knitted, with a filament yarn weft insert if required. The fabric is washed and shrunk, followed by any required dyeing. The fabric is thermo-stabilized, one surface is coated with an adhesive and the other surface is roughened. Preferred Features: The surface is roughened by rubbing with emery paper, wound in a spiral round a roller to rotate against the fabric. The emery paper has a grain size of 40-1000 and pref. 100-500. The surface is roughened before the other surface is coated with adhesive, during a finishing stage. Or it can be after the adhesive has been applied to one surface. At the roughening stage, a number of emery rollers can be used, powered independently of each other, rotating in independent directions with or against the direction of fabric travel.

Abstract (de)

Diese Erfindung beschreibt eine elastische Einlage aus einem Träger aus einem Gewebe, Gewirke oder Gewirke mit Schußeintrag, wobei das Material des Kett- und/oder Schußfadens ein Filamentgarn ist, und mit einer auf einer Seite dieses Trägers aufgebrachten Adhäsivschicht, wobei diese Einlage auf der nicht mit dem Adhäsiv versehenen Seite gerauht ist. Bevorzugt wird ein falschdrahttexturiertes Polyester-, Polyamid- oder Polyacryl- Filamentgarn mit einer Garnfeinheit im Bereich von 15 bis 440 dtex verwendet. Diese Erfindung beschreibt weiterhin ein Verfahren zu Herstellung einer solchen aufgerauhten Einlage sowie ihre Verwendung zur Verstärkung von Bekleidungsstücken, insbesondere des Vorderteils von Bekleidungsstücken oder Krägen und Manschetten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 27/06; D06C 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/06 (2006.01); D06C 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 27/00 (2013.01); A41D 27/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] DE 9319870 U1 19940601 - KUFNER TEXTILWERKE GMBH [DE]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 95, no. 7 31 August 1995 (1995-08-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 632 (C - 1280) 2 December 1994 (1994-12-02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025766 A1 20000809; EP 1025766 B1 20040421; AT 264627 T 20040515; DE 59909234 D1 20040527; DK 1025766 T3 20040802; ES 2216359 T3 20041016; HK 1030728 A1 20050218; PT 1025766 E 20040831; SI 1025766 T1 20040831

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160114

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: KUFNER HOLDING GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20151228

2015-10-20 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KUFNER HOLDING GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-09-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUFNER HOLDING GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-09-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2015-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100204

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: KUFNER TEXTIL GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20111125

2011-12-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUFNER TEXTIL GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-12-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUFNER HOLDING GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-11-21 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KUFNER TEXTIL GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-11-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN & EITLE, DE

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100204

2011-09-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110411

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2010-12-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2010-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2010-11-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2010-10-29 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20100913

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100203

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-10-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KUFNER TEXTILWERKE G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-12-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090116

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090108

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090204

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090206

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-04-30 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20071223

2006-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: LAINIERE DE PICARDIE, BUIRE COURCELLES

2006-03-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: LAINIERE DE PICARDIE, BUIRE COURCELLES

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-05-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: LAINIERE DE PICARDIE, BUIRE COURCELLES

2005-03-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: LAINIERE DE PICARDIE, BUIRE COURCELLES

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-02-18 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1030728

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-02-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2216359

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-08-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-06-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20040401376

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV RO SI

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHERBEL, ULRICH, DIPL.-ING.

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GERLICHER, ANTJE, DIPL.-ING.

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020704

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19991228;LT PAYMENT 19991228;LV PAYMENT 19991228;RO PAYMENT 19991228;SI PAYMENT 19991228

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990203

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19991228;LT PAYMENT 19991228;LV PAYMENT 19991228;MK;RO PAYMENT 19991228;SI PAYMENT 19991228