Global patent index - EP 1025767 A2

EP 1025767 A2 2000-08-09 - Device for protecting human parts or objects from shocks and blows

Title (en)

Device for protecting human parts or objects from shocks and blows

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Schutz von Körperteilen oder Gegenständen vor mechanischen Schlägen oder Stössen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection de parties du corps ou d'objets contre les coups ou chocs mécaniques

Publication

EP 1025767 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890033 A

Priority

AT 13499 A

Abstract (en)

An impact protector, comprising either layers (2, 3) with different impact absorbing effects or encased granules or small pieces of impact absorbent material, is new. An impact protector comprises layers (2, 3) of different impact absorbing materials, one or more layers (2) having a high impact absorbing effect in the direction of the incident force (F) and one or more other layers (3) having a low impact absorbing effect in the direction of the body or object (1) to be protected. An Independent claim is also included for an impact protector comprising an impact absorbing material in the form of granules or small pieces surrounded by a casing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einrichtung zum Schutz von Körperteilen oder Gegenständen vor mechanischen Schlägen oder Stößen. Zur Verbesserung der Schutzwirkung bei gleichzeitiger Beibehaltung eines gewissen Tragekomfort im Falle der Anwendung zum Körperschutz und eine möglichst wirtschaftliche Herstellungsmöglichkeit ist vorgesehen, daß die Einrichtung mindestens zwei Schichten aus stoßabsorbierenden Materialien umfaßt und die Schichten (2, 3) aus unterschiedlichen stoßabsorbierenden Materialien bestehen, wobei zumindest eine Schicht (2) aus dem Material mit höherer stoßabsorbierender Wirkung in Richtung der einwirkenden Kraft (F) angeordnet ist und zumindest eine Schicht (3) aus dem Material mit niedrigerer stoßabsorbierender Wirkung in Richtung des zu schützenden Körpers oder Gegenstandes (1) angeordnet ist. Ebenso kann gemäß einer anderen Ausführungsvariante der Erfindung das stoßabsorbierende Material in Form eines Granulats (5), kleinstückigen Materials od. dgl. vorliegen, vorzugsweise aus Nitril-PVC-Schäumen, welches von einer Umhüllung (6) umgeben ist, welche vorzugsweise aus luftdurchlässigem Material aufgebaut oder mit Perforationen (9) od. dgl. versehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025767 A2 20000809; EP 1025767 A3 20010502; AT 406727 B 20000825; AT A13499 A 20000115

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI