Global Patent Index - EP 1025767 A3

EP 1025767 A3 2001-05-02 - Device for protecting human parts or objects from shocks and blows

Title (en)

Device for protecting human parts or objects from shocks and blows

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Schutz von Körperteilen oder Gegenständen vor mechanischen Schlägen oder Stössen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection de parties du corps ou d'objets contre les coups ou chocs mécaniques

Publication

EP 1025767 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00890033 A

Priority

AT 13499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1025767A2] An impact protector, comprising either layers (2, 3) with different impact absorbing effects or encased granules or small pieces of impact absorbent material, is new. An impact protector comprises layers (2, 3) of different impact absorbing materials, one or more layers (2) having a high impact absorbing effect in the direction of the incident force (F) and one or more other layers (3) having a low impact absorbing effect in the direction of the body or object (1) to be protected. An Independent claim is also included for an impact protector comprising an impact absorbing material in the form of granules or small pieces surrounded by a casing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025767 A2 20000809; EP 1025767 A3 20010502; AT 406727 B 20000825; AT A13499 A 20000115

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI