Global patent index - EP 1025768 A1

EP 1025768 A1 2000-08-09 - Ski boot

Title (en)

Ski boot

Title (de)

Schischuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure de ski

Publication

EP 1025768 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00810051 A

Priority

FR 9901326 A

Abstract (en)

Ski boot is constituted from a flexible boot-shaped upper (1) fixed to an intermediate rigid sole (4), on which smooth rib support surfaces (6, 7) are formed, carrying a fixing part (10) for connecting to a ski fixing. The intermediate sole covers a walking sole (11) leaving free the support surfaces which are preferably withdrawn from the walking surface.

Abstract (fr)

Chaussure de ski constituée d'une tige souple (1) en forme de botte fixée à une semelle intermédiaire rigide (4) sur laquelle sont formées des surfaces d'appui lisses (6a, 7a), la semelle intermédiaire étant recouverte d'une semelle de marche (11) laissant libres les surfaces d'appui qui sont de préférence en retrait de la surface de marche. Ces surfaces d'appui sont destinées à s'appuyer et à glisser sur les surfaces correspondantes d'une fixation de sécurité. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A63C 10/10 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/10 (2013.01); A43B 5/0401 (2013.01); A43B 5/0417 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

CH 674623 A5 19900629 - HALDEMANN AG

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025768 A1 20000809; EP 1025768 B1 20030730; DE 60004110 D1 20030904; DE 60004110 T2 20040519; FR 2788946 A1 20000804; FR 2788946 B1 20010406

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070121

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60004110

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021107

2001-05-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI