Global Patent Index - EP 1025777 A3

EP 1025777 A3 2001-01-17 - Base-container for supporting and cleaning brushes

Title (en)

Base-container for supporting and cleaning brushes

Title (de)

Behälter zur Stützung und Reinigung von Bürsten

Title (fr)

Récipient pour le support et nettoyage de brosses

Publication

EP 1025777 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00200277 A

Priority

IT MI990063 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1025777A2] A base-container for brushes, of the type comprising a base proper (11) on which there is applied a hull-shaped cover (12) for containing, protecting and supporting the brush, characterized in that, in the said base (11), a comb (or rake) (13) is moreover provided on which the bristles of the brush engage and against which the said bristles may be rubbed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 17/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025777 A2 20000809; EP 1025777 A3 20010117; IT 246503 Y1 20020409; IT MI990063 U1 20000804; IT MI990063 V0 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI