Global Patent Index - EP 1025790 A1

EP 1025790 A1 2000-08-09 - Shower partition

Title (en)

Shower partition

Title (de)

Duschabtrennung

Title (fr)

Cloison de douche

Publication

EP 1025790 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123347 A

Priority

DE 29902096 U

Abstract (en)

Both the fixed partition wall(s) (1) and sliding door(s) (2) are provided with fittings (3, 7) extending over their top edges (22, 24) to secure them to the support rail (14).

Abstract (de)

Duschabtrennung mit mindestens einem feststehenden Seitenteil und mindestens einem verschiebbaren Flügel, der über eine im oberen Bereich am Seitenteil befestigten Tragschiene verschoben werden kann, wobei sowohl das Seitenteil als auch der Flügel mit über deren obere Ränder übergreifende Beschläge zur Befestigung ausgestattet sind, wobei die Beschläge in ihren oberen Bereich eine Vorrichtung aufweisen, die eine stufenlose Justage der Beschläge und des Seitenteiles zu dem Flügel untereinander ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/34 (2006.01); E05D 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/34 (2013.01); E05D 15/063 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/614 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/688 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/16 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/672 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/114 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902096 U1 19990715; AT 251418 T 20031015; EP 1025790 A1 20000809; EP 1025790 B1 20031008

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DORMA G.M.B.H. + CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20051130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061123

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051013

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051011

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-06-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907282 P 20031113

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARNOLD & SIEDSMA AG

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2003-10-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011213

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI