Global Patent Index - EP 1025791 A1

EP 1025791 A1 2000-08-09 - Pipe shaped handle for vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Pipe shaped handle for vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Rohrförmiges Griffstück für einen Staubsauger

Title (fr)

Poignée tubulaire pour aspirateur

Publication

EP 1025791 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99125550 A

Priority

DE 19900649 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19900649A1] The tubular handgrip (1) is fitted between the suction pipe (3) of the electric vacuum cleaner provided with the suction tool and the suction hose (5) connected to the vacuum cleaner housing, at least the coupling with the suction pipe being releasable, with this end (2) of the handgrip provided as a cushioning jet with an axially adjustable bristle set, for acting as a special mouthpiece.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein rohrförmiges Griffstück, das einerseits mit einer an einem Staubsauger angeschlossenen Saugleitung (5) und andererseits mit einem zum Führen eines Saugmundstückes dienenden Saugrohr (3) koppelbar ist, wobei zumindest die Koppelstelle mit dem Saugrohr (3) lösbar ausgeführt ist. Das aufwendige Auswechseln von Spezialmundstücken kann dadurch entfallen, daß das dem Saugrohr (3) benachbarte Ende (2) des Griffstückes (1) polsterdüsenartig ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/02 (2006.01); A47L 9/06 (2006.01); A47L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/066 (2013.01); A47L 9/02 (2013.01); A47L 9/06 (2013.01); A47L 9/327 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19900649 A1 20000713; EP 1025791 A1 20000809; EP 1025791 B1 20030910

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161231

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59906943

- Effective date: 20150402

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091221

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-01-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906943 P 20031016

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020320

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI