Global Patent Index - EP 1025793 A3

EP 1025793 A3 2000-11-22 - Receptacle structure for domestic apparatus

Title (en)

Receptacle structure for domestic apparatus

Title (de)

Container und dessen Gestaltung für Haushaltsgeräte

Title (fr)

Container et sa structure pour appareil electroménager

Publication

EP 1025793 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00102317 A

Priority

IT TO990089 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1025793A2] The device, in particular for dishwashers, comprises: a breather chamber (12) and a receptacle (10) for the salt intended to form, when mixed with water, a brine for regeneration of a decalcifier. The receptacle (10) includes a casing (14) which defines within it a cavity (16) for containing the brine and from which projects a neck (18) through which the cavity (16) communicates with the washing vessel (20). The neck (18) is surrounded by an outer wall (22) in such a way as to define a substantially annular air space (24) between the neck (18) and the wall (22), the receptacle (10) moreover being associated with a removable closure plug (28). The breather chamber (12) communicates on one side with the external environment and on the other with the washing vessel (20) through the air space (24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4231 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025793 A2 20000809; EP 1025793 A3 20001122; EP 1025793 B1 20040811; DE 60012801 D1 20040916; DE 60012801 T2 20050901; ES 2223326 T3 20050301; IT 1307709 B1 20011114; IT TO990089 A1 20000807

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60012801

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120430

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110204

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120316

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110203

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110203

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-03-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2223326 T3

2004-10-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BITRON S.P.A.

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012801 P 20040916

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RECEPTACLE STRUCTURE FOR ELECTRICAL DOMESTIC APPARATUS

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010507

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI