Global Patent Index - EP 1025884 A3

EP 1025884 A3 2001-05-16 - Lottery ticket, method of making same and method of win determination

Title (en)

Lottery ticket, method of making same and method of win determination

Title (de)

Los, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Verfahren zur Ermittlung seines Gewinns

Title (fr)

Billet de loterie, procédé pour sa fabrication et procédé pour déterminer son gain

Publication

EP 1025884 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100993 A

Priority

DE 19902134 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1025884A2] The lottery number is formed on a unit that is attached to an item of clothing, such as a T-shirt (6). Access is gained using scissors to remove the packaging (1). A badge is attached (5) that has a transparent cover over a lottery number (8a) on a label. Any attempt at removing the label causes partial damage and prevents falsification.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 3/06; A41D 1/00; A41D 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/08 (2006.01); A63F 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/065 (2013.01); A41D 27/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19902134 A1 20000727; EP 1025884 A2 20000809; EP 1025884 A3 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011117

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63F 3/06 A, 7A 41D 1/00 B, 7A 41D 27/08 B

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI