Global Patent Index - EP 1025911 A2

EP 1025911 A2 2000-08-09 - High temperature resistant target masking devices

Title (en)

High temperature resistant target masking devices

Title (de)

Hochtemperaturbeständige Abdeckfolie

Title (fr)

Dispositif de masquage résistant aux hautes températures

Publication

EP 1025911 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300857 A

Priority

US 24392599 A

Abstract (en)

A high temperature resistant masking device comprising a substrate having a top surface and a bottom surface, with an adhesive applied to the bottom surface of the substrate for removable attachment of the masking device to a surface to be masked. The masking device includes a transparent substrate with a plurality of markings embossed or printed on the top surface of the substrate to facilitate accurate placement and precision alignment of the masking device on the masking surface. The masking devices are die-cut from sheet material into various shapes and sizes, and placed on a release liner so that they may be readily applied to the surfaces of various parts requiring masking during liquid coating, powder coating, plating or electroplating. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/0456 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025911 A2 20000809; EP 1025911 A3 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI