Global Patent Index - EP 1025914 A2

EP 1025914 A2 2000-08-09 - Grading screen

Title (en)

Grading screen

Title (de)

Sortiersieb

Title (fr)

Tamis pour calibrage

Publication

EP 1025914 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300845 A

Priority

GB 9902397 A

Abstract (en)

A grading screen (1) comprising a multiplicity of substantially parallel crossbars (3) and a multiplicity of link elements (2) bridging across pairs of successive crossbars so as to define an endless grading screen having a multiplicity of openings (15) defined therein. Each opening in the grading screen is defined by two pairs of opposed link elements. The connecting portion of each link element is waisted (12) so that the openings in the grid screen are of generally circular form. The openings may, for example, be of circular or near-circular form, or may even be of hexagonal or near-hexagonal form. A grading screen having rectangular openings is also described, in which additional plastics rods (30) are used to sub-divide the openings defined by the link elements, so as to form smaller openings. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025914 A2 20000809; EP 1025914 A3 20001018; GB 2347882 A 20000920; GB 9902397 D0 19990324

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040323

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DUROMOULD LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI