Global Patent Index - EP 1025917 A1

EP 1025917 A1 2000-08-09 - Method for cleaning and disinfecting beverage dispensers

Title (en)

Method for cleaning and disinfecting beverage dispensers

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Reinigen und Desinfizieren von Getränkezapfstellen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour nettoyer et désinfecter des distributeurs de boissons

Publication

EP 1025917 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100410 A

Priority

DE 19901240 A

Abstract (en)

The hot steam or hot water is supplied to the mouth of the tap (2,3,4), through the drink supply pipes (2a,3a,4a) up to the connections (2b,3b,4b) which have been removed from the drinks supply container (7). Cold water is then passed on the same route. The temperature and through-flow times of the hot steam, hot water and cold water are monitored and regulated through the control device associated with the valves. The cold water preferably passes through a sterile filter prior to flushing through the pipes.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zum Reinigen und Desinfizieren von Getränkezapfstellen (2,3,4) mittels Heissdampf oder Heisswasser. Der Heissdampf bzw das Heisswasser wird in die Mündung der Zapfstelle (2,3,4) eingebracht und durch die Getränkezuführleitungen (2a, 3a,4a) bis zu deren Anschlüssen (2b,3b,4b), die von den Getränkevorratsbehältern (7) abgetrennt wurden, geführt und aus diesen Anschlüssen herausgebracht. Daran anschliessend wird Kaltwasser in die Mündung der Zapfstellen (2,3,4) eingebracht und auf dem gleichen Weg durch die Getränkezuführleitungen (2a, 3a,4a) geführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/027; B67D 1/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/02 (2006.01); B08B 9/027 (2006.01); B67D 1/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/032 (2013.01); B08B 9/0326 (2013.01); B67D 1/07 (2013.01); B08B 2230/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025917 A1 20000809

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020801

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHROETER, FRANZ

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MERTENS, HEINZ

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI