Global Patent Index - EP 1025921 B1

EP 1025921 B1 2000-08-23 - Apparatus for straightening metallic articles

Title (en)

Apparatus for straightening metallic articles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Richten von metallischem Gut

Title (fr)

Dispositif de dressage de pièces métalliques

Publication

EP 1025921 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98124829 A

Priority

EP 98124829 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1016472A1] At least one uncoupling device (38, 42) is provided in the negative momentum region, which can uncouple the roller drive shaft from the transfer case (30) in the event of negative momentum arising. Rolled metal is straightened out using a machine with a number of rollers arranged in a zig-zag path, and at least one transfer case driven by one or more motors and driving shafts for rotating the rollers, generating areas of positive and negative momentum.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Richten von metallischem Gut, mit einer Mehrzahl von zick-zackförmig angeordneten Richtwalzen, mit wenigstens einem Verteilergetriebe (30), das von wenigstens einem Motor angetrieben ist und mechanisch gekoppelte Abtriebsstränge aufweist, die zumindest einen Teil der Richtwalzen antreiben, wobei Bereiche positiver Momente und negativer Momente auftreten. Sie zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß wenigstens eine richtungsgeschaltete Kopplung (38;42) oder eine Entkupplungseinrichtung im Bereich der negativen Momente vorgesehen ist, die das Entstehen von negativen Momenten reduziert oder ganz verhindert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 1/02; B21D 1/05; B21D 3/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/02 (2006.01); B21D 3/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 3/05 (2013.01); B21D 1/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016472 A1 20000705; AT 195675 T 20000915; DE 59800249 D1 20001019; EP 1025921 A1 20000809; EP 1025921 B1 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-13 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800249

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-19

2000-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195675

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990806

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI