Global Patent Index - EP 1025926 A3

EP 1025926 A3 2000-08-23 - Method and apparatus for reclaiming casting sand

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for reclaiming casting sand

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wiederaufbereitung von Giessereisand

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la récupération de sable de fonderie

Publication

EP 1025926 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00102650 A

Priority

  • JP 2947099 A
  • JP 33906899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1025926A2] A method of reclaiming casting sand comprises the steps of throwing casting sand into a processing tank (1) and reclaiming the casting sand while air pressure in the processing tank (1) is kept lower than air pressure outside the processing tank, and discharging the reclaimed casting sand from the processing tank while the internal air pressure is kept higher than the external air pressure. An apparatus for reclaiming and cooling casting sand, comprising means (p) for fluidizing casting sand, means disposed above the fluidizing means for cooling the fluidized casting sand, means disposed above the cooling means for scaling (2) bonds from particles of the casting sand by friction, and means disposed above the cooling means for having relatively large dust particles sedimented is characterized by the bond-scaling means, being configured such that the reclaimed casting sand can be discharged into the fluidizing means therethrough.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 5/02; B22C 5/08; B22C 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 5/00 (2006.01); B22C 5/02 (2006.01); B22C 5/08 (2006.01); B22C 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 5/10 (2013.01); B22C 5/02 (2013.01); B22C 5/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025926 A2 20000809; EP 1025926 A3 20000823; EP 1025926 B1 20040519; CN 1264630 A 20000830; DE 60010775 D1 20040624; DE 60010775 T2 20040923; KR 20000057955 A 20000925; TW 462901 B 20011111

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100208

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100208

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100208

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60010775

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030512

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010105

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI