Global Patent Index - EP 1025927 A1

EP 1025927 A1 2000-08-09 - Method for making sand molds in a blow-and-squeeze-type apparatus

Title (en)

Method for making sand molds in a blow-and-squeeze-type apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Sandformen in einer Schuss- und Pressformmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour fabriquer des moules en sable dans une machine de soufflage et compression

Publication

EP 1025927 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00102465 A

Priority

JP 2691299 A

Abstract (en)

A new method for making a sand mold in a blow-and-squeeze-type apparatus is provided. The apparatus comprises a pattern plate (1), a flask (2,3), a squeeze plate (6,7), and a blow head (8). This method is characterized in that the compactability of the molding sand of the obtained mold can be easily calculated, and in that when the molding sand of the obtained mold has a compactability that is outside the permissible range, before the next mold is made the molding condition(s) of the apparatus for making a mold and/or the mixing condition(s) of the mixer is modified. Thus, even though the properties and conditions of the molding sand change, molds having desired and suitable properties and conditions can be made. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 19/04; B22C 15/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 15/02 (2006.01); B22C 15/24 (2006.01); B22C 15/28 (2006.01); B22C 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 19/04 (2013.01); B22C 15/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025927 A1 20000809; EP 1025927 B1 20040428; EP 1025927 B2 20090506; DE 60010137 D1 20040603; DE 60010137 T2 20040909; DE 60010137 T3 20090924; JP 2000225440 A 20000815; JP 4092673 B2 20080528

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-05-06 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090506

2009-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-09-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-02-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-01-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DISA INDUSTRIES A/S

- Effective date: 20041122

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60010137 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030411

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010105

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI