Global Patent Index - EP 1025935 A1

EP 1025935 A1 2000-08-09 - Method and device for manufacturing engine blocks

Title (en)

Method and device for manufacturing engine blocks

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Herstellung von Motorblöcken

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de blocs moteurs

Publication

EP 1025935 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101663 A

Priority

DE 19904971 A

Abstract (en)

The engine block (1) production device includes a costing mold in which cylinder liners (3) are mounted on a coquille mandrel (4). The thermal expansion properties of the liner and the mandrel are such that the liner fits on the mandrel without play, at least during the solidification phase of the cast material. The mandrels center the liners with high precision.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung für die Herstellung von Motorblöcken mit einer Gießform, in welcher unter Einbindung in einen Motorblock (1) zu umgießende Zylinderlaufbuchsen (3) jeweils auf einen Kokillendorn (4) aufgesteckt sind, sowie ein entsprechendes Herstellungsverfahren. Gemäß der Erfindung werden die aufgesteckte Zylinderlaufbuchse und der Kokillendorn in ihrem Wärmeausdehnungsverhalten derart aufeinander abgestimmt, daß die Zylinderlaufbuchse auf dem Kokillendorn wenigstens während der Erstarrungsphase des Gußmaterials spielfrei aufsitzt. Vorteilhaft erfolgt durch die Dorne eine genaue Zentrierung der Zylinderlaufbuchsen, wobei insbesondere Schieflagen der Buchsen im Motorblock vermieden werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/0009 (2013.01); F02F 2007/009 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025935 A1 20000809; DE 19904971 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAW ALUCAST GMBH

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAW MANDL & BERGER GMBH

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030124

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20010130

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010130

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI