Global Patent Index - EP 1025950 A2

EP 1025950 A2 2000-08-09 - A clamping device with an articulated lever

Title (en)

A clamping device with an articulated lever

Title (de)

Klemmeinrichtung mit einem Gelenkhebel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage comportant un levier articulé

Publication

EP 1025950 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00102316 A

Priority

IT TO990092 A

Abstract (en)

A clamping device with an articulated lever comprises a body (3) and a lever (10) projecting from the body (3) through a slot (13). The lever (10) is connected by means of a toggle joint (9) to an operating rod (7) of a pneumatic actuator cylinder (5) and is mounted for pivoting about an axis (A) so that it can move to and fro along the slot (13) between a plurality of configurations at least one of which corresponds to a restraining configuration of the lever (10). Closure means (31; 33) associated with the slot (13) for closing the slot when the lever (10) is in any angular position include a cover element (31; 33) which is rotatable coaxially about the axis of pivoting of the lever (10) and is coupled for rotation with the lever (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23K 37/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 37/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23K 37/0435 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 8908288 U1 19890921

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025950 A2 20000809; EP 1025950 A3 20011024; IT 1307148 B1 20011029; IT TO990092 A1 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030902

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI