Global Patent Index - EP 1025960 A1

EP 1025960 A1 2000-08-09 - Setting tool

Title (en)

Setting tool

Title (de)

Setzgerät

Title (fr)

Outil de scellement

Publication

EP 1025960 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810034 A

Priority

DE 19903993 A

Abstract (en)

The powder-driven insertion machine has a housing (1) and guide cylinder (2) in whose inner bore (25) is a drive piston (4). A control pin (8) protrudes from the guide cylinder and cooperates with a counter-surface (26). An ignition pin (16) is connected with the release slide-piece (19) operated by a trigger (15). The housing contains a retainer pin (9) protruding inside the guide cylinder. The shortest distance (A3) between the retainer pin and a base (28)of the inner bore corresponds to the length of the drive piston .

Abstract (de)

Das pulverkraftbetriebene Setzgerät weist ein Gehäuse (1), einen relativ zum Gehäuse (1) versetzbaren Führungszylinder (2), einen in dem Führungszylinder (2) angeordneten Treibkolben (4), einen entgegen der Setzrichtung von dem Führungszylinder (2) abragenden Steuerstift (8) und einen entgegen der Setzrichtung gegen die Kraft eines Federelementes (18) versetzbaren Zündstift (16) mit einem Mitnehmer (17) auf, dessen Gegenfläche (26) nur in die axiale Projektionsfläche des Steuerstiftes (8) versetzbar ist, wenn sich der Zündstift (16) und der Führungszylinder (2) in der Ausgangsstellung befinden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/10 (2006.01); B25C 1/14 (2006.01); B25D 9/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 9/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19903993 A1 20000803; AT 252964 T 20031115; CA 2297429 A1 20000802; CA 2297429 C 20061010; DE 50004207 D1 20031204; EP 1025960 A1 20000809; EP 1025960 B1 20031029; JP 2000218569 A 20000808; PL 191742 B1 20060630; PL 338167 A1 20000814; US 6126055 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50004207

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50004207

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HILTI A.G.

- Effective date: 20070131

2006-10-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060114

2006-09-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-03-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060115

2006-01-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060114

2006-01-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060114

2005-01-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050112

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050112

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050107

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050103

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-02-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031221

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004207 P 20031204

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE GB NL SE

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE GB NL SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE GB NL SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI