Global Patent Index - EP 1025996 A1

EP 1025996 A1 2000-08-09 - Forme cylinder

Title (en)

Forme cylinder

Title (de)

Klischeezylinder

Title (fr)

Cylindre porte-cliché

Publication

EP 1025996 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102033 A

Priority

EP 99102033 A

Abstract (en)

The printing cylinder has a cylinder core (10) on which a sleeve (20) containing carbon fiber is arranged. The sleeve is self-supporting and held spaced apart from the peripheral surface (18) of the cylinder core by plates (22) at both ends. The cylinder core is designed to be used as a printing cylinder, independent of the sleeve. The core has an axial channel (14) for compressed air.

Abstract (de)

Druckzylinder mit einem Zylinderkern (10), auf dem eine kohlefaserhaltige Hülse (20) angeordnet ist, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Hülse (20) selbsttragend und durch an beiden Enden angeordnete Scheiben (22) auf Abstand zur Umfangsfläche (18) des Zylinderkerns (10) gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/10; B41F 13/10; B41N 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/34 (2006.01); B41F 13/08 (2006.01); B41F 13/10 (2006.01); B41F 27/10 (2006.01); B41N 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/105 (2013.01); B41F 13/10 (2013.01); B41N 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1025996 A1 20000809; EP 1025996 B1 20011128; DE 59900456 D1 20020110; ES 2166201 T3 20020401; JP 2000225681 A 20000815; US 2002056387 A1 20020516; US 6523470 B2 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-23 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050610

2005-11-23 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20050610

2005-02-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: COMEXI, SA

- Effective date: 20020904

2004-06-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COMEXI, SA

- Effective date: 20020904

2004-06-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER

- Effective date: 20040429

2004-02-04 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: COMEXI, SA

- Effective date: 20020904

2004-01-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-01 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PLATE CYLINDER

2003-09-17 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PLATE CYLINDER

2002-10-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COMEXI, SA

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166201 T3

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020304

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900456 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PLATE CYLINDER

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990804

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI