Global Patent Index - EP 1026003 A2

EP 1026003 A2 2000-08-09 - Coated paper sheet for electro-coagulation printing

Title (en)

Coated paper sheet for electro-coagulation printing

Title (de)

Beschichtetes Blatt Papier für das Elektrokoagulationsdruckverfahren

Title (fr)

Feuille de papier couchée pour l'impression par électrocoagulation

Publication

EP 1026003 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300799 A

Priority

JP 2834199 A

Abstract (en)

In a coated paper sheet for electro-coagulation printing includes a support paper sheet and at least one coating layer formed on the support sheet, a total pore volume of fine pores contained in the coated paper sheet and having a pore size of 0.01 to 0.40 mu m is controlled to 0.10 to 0.20 ml/g, as determined by a mercury porosimeter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/20 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); D21H 19/40 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/5218 (2013.01); B41C 1/105 (2013.01); B41M 2205/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026003 A2 20000809; EP 1026003 A3 20001011; CA 2297588 A1 20000805; JP 2000226792 A 20000815

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020410

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI