Global Patent Index - EP 1026007 A2

EP 1026007 A2 2000-08-09 - Abrasion resistant decoration

Title (en)

Abrasion resistant decoration

Title (de)

Widerstandsfähiges Dekor

Title (fr)

Décor résistant à l'abrasion

Publication

EP 1026007 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101858 A

Priority

DE 19903914 A

Abstract (en)

Printed, patterned layers are included between substrate and the layer providing color. An Independent claim is included for the method of manufacture

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein widerstandsfähiges Overlay (1), ein Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung, ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines mehrschichtigen Belagelementes sowie auf Verwendung derartiger Belagelemente. Derartige Overlays (1) und Belagelemente sowie Verfahren werden beispielsweise für abriebfeste dekorative Schichtstoffe, insbesondere für Fußbodenelemente oder Laminate im Bereich der Möbelherstellung verwendet. Das erfindungsgemäße Overlay (1) zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß es eine Trägerschicht (7) mit einer als Sicht-seite dienenden Oberseite und einer im applizierten Zustand dem Belagelement zugewandten Unterseite aufweist, wobei die Oberseite der Trägerschicht mit einem abriebfesten Material versehen ist und die Unterseite der Trägerschicht im Konterdruck mit muster- und farbgebenden Schichten (2, 3, 4) bedruckt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44C 5/04; B32B 27/04; E04F 13/00; E04F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/20 (2006.01); B32B 27/04 (2006.01); B44C 5/04 (2006.01); D06N 7/06 (2006.01); E04F 13/00 (2006.01); E04F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/206 (2013.01); B32B 27/04 (2013.01); B44C 5/0446 (2013.01); E04F 13/00 (2013.01); E04F 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026007 A2 20000809; EP 1026007 A3 20030910; DE 19903914 A1 20000810; DE 19903914 B4 20050519; PL 338173 A1 20000814

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071006

2006-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAUSCHLINNEMANN GMBH

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 44C 5/04 A

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 32B 27/04 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04F 13/00 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04F 15/00 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47B 96/20 B

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI