Global Patent Index - EP 1026010 A2

EP 1026010 A2 2000-08-09 - Pneumatic tire

Title (en)

Pneumatic tire

Title (de)

Luftreifen

Title (fr)

Bandage pneumatique

Publication

EP 1026010 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300836 A

Priority

  • JP 2592599 A
  • JP 18489499 A
  • JP 2000021258 A

Abstract (en)

This invention relates to a pneumatic tire comprising a tread at least a surface portion of which is made of a foamed rubber composition, the foamed rubber composition including closed cells formed by compounding a foaming agent and a foaming assistant which contains sodium benzenesulfinate or a combination of sodium benzenesulfinate and urea. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60C 11/00; B60C 1/00; C08J 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 1/00 (2006.01); B60C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60C 11/14 (2013.01); B60C 1/0016 (2013.01); B60C 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026010 A2 20000809; EP 1026010 A3 20020116; EP 1026010 B1 20040929; DE 60014200 D1 20041104; DE 60014200 T2 20060216; ES 2226710 T3 20050401; US 6497261 B1 20021224

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160203

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRIDGESTONE CORP., TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60014200

- Effective date: 20140828

2014-09-12 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140812

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110204

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110203

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110203

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100202

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226710 T3

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60014200 P 20041104

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI