Global Patent Index - EP 1026079 A2

EP 1026079 A2 2000-08-09 - Method and device for detecting and removing defective and/or defectively positioned cigarettes

Title (en)

Method and device for detecting and removing defective and/or defectively positioned cigarettes

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Detektieren sowie Beseitigen fehlerhafter und/oder fehlerhaft positionierter Zigaretten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour détecter et rejeter des cigarettes défectueuses ou mal positionées

Publication

EP 1026079 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100309 A

Priority

DE 19903777 A

Abstract (en)

The detector is fitted to a cigarette making machine and has cameras (17) to create a digital image which is processed (18) and compared with a reference picture to detect cigarettes which are faulty or out of position (16). The detection of a failure causes the ejection of several cigarettes from the magazine (10).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Detektieren sowie ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Beseitigen fehlerhafter und/oder fehlerhaft positionierter, insbesondere querliegender, Zigaretten im Zigarettenmagazin einer Zigarettenherstellung- bzw. -verpackungsmaschine. Der Erfindung liegt das Problem zugrunde, die Vermeidung von Störungen im Zigarettenmagazin zu verbessern. Diese Problem wird dadurch gelöst, daß zum Detektieren mittels eines optischen Prüforgans ein Bild der sich im Zigarettenmagazin befindenden Zigaretten erfaßt, das Bild von einer Bildverarbeitungseinrichtung ausgewertet, und, falls beim Auswerten Abweichungen des erfaßten Bildes von einem Referenzbild bzw. - wert festgestellt werden, ein Fehlersignal erzeugt wird. Die Erfindung betrifft auch eine entsprechende Vorrichtung dafür. Ferner wird das Problem gelöst durch Beseitigen fehlerhafter Zigaretten, wobei in Reaktion auf eine entsprechende Detektion eine im Bereich des Magazins angeordnete Auswurfeinheit betätigt wird zum Auswerfen mehrerer Zigaretten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/345 (2006.01); A24C 5/34 (2006.01); B07C 5/342 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/3412 (2013.01); B07C 5/3422 (2013.01); Y10S 131/906 (2013.01); Y10S 131/91 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19903777 A1 20000803; BR 0000542 A 20001031; BR 0000542 B1 20110222; CN 1199039 C 20050427; CN 1264038 A 20000823; EP 1026079 A2 20000809; EP 1026079 A3 20020717; EP 1026079 B1 20040414; JP 2000217564 A 20000808; JP 4343375 B2 20091014; US 6446632 B1 20020910

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160107

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160107

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160107

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006030

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150107

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150116

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040726

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006030 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030214

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020927

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI