Global Patent Index - EP 1026087 A1

EP 1026087 A1 2000-08-09 - Set of containers for flowable goods

Title (en)

Set of containers for flowable goods

Title (de)

Gebindesystem für fliessfähige Güter

Title (fr)

Gamme des conteneurs pour matériaux coulables

Publication

EP 1026087 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102055 A

Priority

EP 99102055 A

Abstract (en)

The goods are packaged in a series of identical shape plastic containers with different volumes. Each container is sealed with a lid and has essentially transparent side walls. The container lids and bases are designed to allow containers to be stacked on top of each other. The lid and label(s) are also transparent.

Abstract (de)

Der vorliegenden Erfindung die Aufgabe zugrunde, ein Gebindesystem bereitzustellen, welches einerseits eine möglichst ungehinderte und aussagekräftige optische Überprüfung des Behälterinhalts ohne Öffnung des Behälters ermöglicht, darüber hinaus für die Verpackung, den Transport, die Lagerung und insbesondere die sortimentsweise Präsentation von sortimentsweise zusammengehörigen jedoch füreinander verschiedenen Waren für einen einheitlichen Verwendungsbereich geeignet ist. Zur technischen Lösung wird mit der Erfindung vorgeschlagen ein Gebindesystem für fließfähige Güter, bestehend aus Gruppen von jeweils im wesentlichen gleichförmigen Behältertypen, welche jeweils durch Deckel verschließbare Kunststoff-Behälter mit unterschiedlichen Volumen umfassen, welche im wesentlichen vollständig durchsichtige Seitenwandungen aufweisen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/10; B44D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026087 A1 20000809; PL 335324 A1 20000814

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050901

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020911

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI