Global Patent Index - EP 1026089 A2

EP 1026089 A2 2000-08-09 - Short life kegs

Title (en)

Short life kegs

Title (de)

Kurzlebige Fässer

Title (fr)

Barils à durée de vie limitée

Publication

EP 1026089 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300419 A

Priority

  • GB 9901943 A
  • GB 9903928 A

Abstract (en)

A limited usage container such as a keg 10 is designed to be used only once, or to be used and refilled only a few times. It comprises a mild steel body 12 provided internally with a protective polymeric lacquer, and is capable of containing service pressures of 400 kNm<-2>. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 8/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 8/16 (2006.01); B65D 8/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 7/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026089 A2 20000809; EP 1026089 A3 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI