Global patent index - EP 1026089 A3

EP 1026089 A3 2000-10-11 - Short life kegs

Title (en)

Short life kegs

Title (de)

Kurzlebige Fässer

Title (fr)

Barils à durée de vie limitée

Publication

EP 1026089 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00300419 A

Priority

  • GB 9901943 A
  • GB 9903928 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026089A2] A limited usage container such as a keg 10 is designed to be used only once, or to be used and refilled only a few times. It comprises a mild steel body 12 provided internally with a protective polymeric lacquer, and is capable of containing service pressures of 400 kNm<-2>. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 8/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 8/16 (2006.01); B65D 8/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 7/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026089 A2 20000809; EP 1026089 A3 20001011

INPADOC legal status

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-02-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI