Global Patent Index - EP 1026102 A1

EP 1026102 A1 2000-08-09 - Container for the dispensing of liquid and pasty material

Title (en)

Container for the dispensing of liquid and pasty material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Abgabe von flüssigem und pastösem Füllgut

Title (fr)

Récipient pour la distribution des matériaux liquides et pâteux

Publication

EP 1026102 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102339 A

Priority

DE 19904605 A

Abstract (en)

The pressure unit of the device has a wall with different thicknesses. The pressure unit(4) has an annular bead(5) on the upper edge, and the product container(7) has an annular slot on the upper flange to accommodate it. The annular bead is higher than the annular slot. The upper neck of the outer container and retaining cap may have an outwards protruding shoulder or retaining ring. A valve combination(1) fixed in a metal cap(2) is pressed into the pressure unit and product container.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Abgabe von flüssigem und pastösen Produkten mit einer aus Gummi bestehenden Druckeinheit (4) und einem im Inneren der Druckeinheit befindlichen Produktbehälter (7), wobei Druckeinheit (4) und Produktbehälter (7) in einen Außenbehälter (9) gesteckt werden. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Wandung der Druckeinheit (4) unterschiedliche Wandstärken aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/0061 (2013.01); B65D 2231/001 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026102 A1 20000809; CA 2298234 A1 20000805; JP 2000226084 A 20000815

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-14 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031856

2002-07-24 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020603

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI