Global patent index - EP 1026109 A1

EP 1026109 A1 2000-08-09 - Process and device for the distribution of work-pieces at predetermined distances

Title (en)

Process and device for the distribution of work-pieces at predetermined distances

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zuteilen von Werkstücken in vorgegebenen Abständen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour distribuer des pièces d'oeuvres à d' intervalles prédéterminés

Publication

EP 1026109 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102006 A

Priority

EP 99102006 A

Abstract (en)

A pre-defined number of consecutive workpieces are transported over a given distance in a direction at right angles to their length axis following the orientation step, until a pre-determined cover layer is formed, and then this layer is lifted clear of its support surface and laid down again. The preferably elongated workpieces are spaced apart at given intervals and oriented so that their length axis is at right angles to the transport direction. The workpieces are then transported to a position above a support surface, upon which they are laid. An Independent claim is also included for the sorting machine, containing two synchronized conveyors (10) with support rails (11) moving backwards and forwards at right angles to the transport direction.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Vereinzelung und Zuteilung von Werkstücken, insbesondere von länglichen Werkstücken wie Holzbrettern, in vorgegebenen Abständen voneinander oder dicht aneinanderliegend durch Fördern und Vereinzeln und Ausrichten der Werkstücke in ihrer Längsachse quer zur Förderrichtung, wobei eine vorgegebene Anzahl aufeinanderfolgender Werkstücke jeweils nach dem Ausrichten um eine vorbestimmte Distanz in Querrichtung weitergefördert wird, bis eine vorbestimmte Decklage zusammengestellt ist, durch Weiterfördem bis oberhalb einer vorgegebenen Unterlage und durch Ablegen der Decklage auf der Unterlage. Die Zuteilvorrichtung ist durch synchron gekoppelte, in der Förderrichtung hin und her fahrbare und quer zur Förderrichtung verschiebbare Transporter [10] mit Trägerschienen [11] gekennzeichnet. Die Erfindung ist insbesondere bedeutsam für das Bereitstellen von Deckbretter-Lagen und deren Einlegen in die Nagelschablonen bei der Holzpalettenfertigung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 57/18; B27F 7/00; B27M 3/00; B65G 57/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27M 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27M 3/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026109 A1 20000809; EP 1026109 B1 20030806; DE 59906499 D1 20030911

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906499

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906499

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-11-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080325

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-01-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031128

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906499

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI