Global Patent Index - EP 1026110 A2

EP 1026110 A2 2000-08-09 - Method of and device for transfering a running web

Title (en)

Method of and device for transfering a running web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Überführen einer laufenden Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour transférer une bande en mouvement

Publication

EP 1026110 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122209 A

Priority

DE 19900986 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19900986A1] To transfer a moving web and especially a paper web (10) to a target roller, moving cutters (20,21) trim a transfer leader strip (30) from the web (10) parallel to the direction (L) of web travel. To give the leader strip (30) a pointed leading end (32), at least one cutter (20,21) alignment is changed to give the cuts (40-43) on a line towards each other by a cutter width positioning towards one of the web edges (12,13). The cutters (20,21) are set so that their cuts (40-43) in the web (10) have a common start point (A), and the cut lines (40-43) intersect each other. The two parallel cuts (40,41) which define the cut leader strip (30) can diverge from a single common cut line to give the pointed leading end (32). The spaced cutters (20,21) can pivot on an axis at right angles to the web (10) by 90 deg , to cut the leading end (32) of the strip. The cut lines (40-43) formed by the cutters (20,21) are brought together at the start point (32) of the cut strip (30), to form a nominal shear point. The transfer leader strip (30) is cut generally at the center of the web (10), narrower than the web width, in a constant width along its length. The cutters (20,21) are moved towards different edges (12,13) of the web (10), at right angles to the direction (L) of web movement, after cutting their lines (40,41) in the web. The transfer leader strip (30) is cut after cutting a preceding strip (36), parallel to the direction (L) of web travel and close to an edge (12,13) of the web (10). The web (10) and especially two edge sections and two strip edges are moved on a path alongside the target area, and particularly into the machine cellar or into the pulper of a paper machine. The leading end (32) of the strip (30) is fed to the target area and/or a carrier directly after the start of the strip (30) cutting action. The cut strip (30) is moved as close to an ideal path as possible between the cutters (20,21) and the target zone. The web (10) is supported while the leader strip (30) is cut, especially by a roller and/or a fourdrinier. On an unsupported path, the web is cut during its free movement directly in front of a roller. The cutters (20,21) are jets which deliver a fluid jet stream and especially of water, on an alignment to strike the web (10) at an angle to its surface normals. An Independent claim is included for a section of the papermaking machine where the strip cutters (20,21) are operated and moved independently of each other. Preferred Features: The cutters (20,21) are held at a constant gap from each other, in relation to the direction (L) of web travel, and are moved on a common axis at right angles to the direction (L) of movement on a common carrier, and rotate on an axis at right angles to the web travel direction (L). The cutters (20,21) are jets to deliver a fluid jet stream at the web (10), a rotating and circular sawtooth cutting blade, a fixed cutting blade, a needle or a laser.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Überführen einer laufenden Materialbahn, insbesondere einer Papierbahn, in einen Zielbereich, insbesondere auf eine Zielwalze, bei dem mittels wenigstens zwei in einer zur Materialbahn etwa parallelen Ebene relativ zur Materialbahn bewegbaren Schneidorganen in der laufenden Materialbahn ein etwa parallel zur Laufrichtung der Materialbahn verlaufender Überführstreifen geschnitten wird, wobei zum Schneiden eines insbesondere spitzenförmigen Anfangs des Überführstreifens wenigstens eines der Schneidorgane aus einer zumindest näherungsweise gleichen, wenigstens einander angenäherte Schnitte bewirkenden Breitenposition der Schneidorgane heraus in Richtung eines der Bahnränder bewegt wird. Die Erfindung betrifft außerdem eine Vorrichtung zum Überführen einer laufenden Materialbahn, insbesondere zur Durchführung des erfindungsgemäßen Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/26; B65H 19/28; D21G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/26 (2006.01); B65H 26/02 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 26/025 (2013.01); B65H 19/265 (2013.01); D21G 9/0063 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41896 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5151 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51534 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0591 (2015.04); Y10T 83/364 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19900986 A1 20000720; DE 59914147 D1 20070222; EP 1026110 A2 20000809; EP 1026110 A3 20040211; EP 1026110 B1 20070110; US 6379502 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59914147

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121106

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121107

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111114

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071011

2007-04-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914147

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-02-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 65H 19/26 A

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 65H 19/28 B

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7D 21G 9/00 B

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI