Global Patent Index - EP 1026111 A3

EP 1026111 A3 2001-04-18 - Injector for rotary web processing device with fixed diameter base

Title (en)

Injector for rotary web processing device with fixed diameter base

Title (de)

Einzug für rotatorische Vorrichtung zum Behandeln einer Bahn mit festem Durchmesser

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation d'un appareil de traitment rotatif d'une bande avec diamètre de base fixe

Publication

EP 1026111 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00300907 A

Priority

US 24532799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026111A2] A unique rotary die cutting system including an injector mechanism (6) that accurately positions a moving continuous web (3) in such manner as to permit the implementation of a set of constant diameter cylindrical bases (1) onto which are mounted by various means a pair of removable complementary steel sheet dies (2). The integrated action of the novel sub-sections of the invention permits significant improvements in economies of operation relative to exiting rotary converting technologies. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/04; B65H 20/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/88 (2006.01); B26D 5/20 (2006.01); B26F 1/38 (2006.01); B65H 20/04 (2006.01); B65H 23/04 (2006.01); B65H 23/188 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/384 (2013.01); B26D 5/20 (2013.01); B65H 23/04 (2013.01); B65H 23/1882 (2013.01); B65H 2301/3112 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026111 A2 20000809; EP 1026111 A3 20010418; CA 2297860 A1 20000805; JP 2000309458 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 23/04 A, 7B 65H 20/24 B

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI