Global Patent Index - EP 1026113 A2

EP 1026113 A2 2000-08-09 - Foil dispenser

Title (en)

Foil dispenser

Title (de)

Folienspendeeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Distributeur de film

Publication

EP 1026113 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102469 A

Priority

  • DE 29902047 U
  • DE 19904783 A

Abstract (en)

Film dispenser has a support for a roll (10) of the film, guides for a film section drawn from the roll and a film cutting blade (40). The leading end (18) of the film is drawn from the roll by hand and the film movement initiates operation of the cutting blade relative to the film guide (22) to cut off a length (l) of film.

Abstract (de)

Eine Folienspendeeinrichtung umfaßt eine Lagerung (13) für eine Folienvorratsrolle (10) mit Folienbewicklung, insbesondere Kunststofffolien-, Papierfolien-, Zellstofffolien- oder Metalifolienbewicklung, für Küche, Labor, Klinik und ähnliche Bedarfsstellen, Leitmittel (22) zur annähernden Festlegung eines auf einen Schneidvorgang abgestimmten Wegverlaufs (16,20) eines von der Folienvorratsrolle (10) abgezogenen, abzutrennenden Folienvorlaufabschnitts (l), und Schneidmittel (40) mit mindestens einer Schneidkante (42) in Zuordnung zu diesem Wegverlauf (16,20); durch eine Handmanipulation des Folienvorlaufabschnitts (l), insbesondere seines Vorlaufendes (18), ist eine ein Abschneiden des jeweiligen Folienvorlaufabschnitts (l) auslösende Relativbewegung der Schneidkante (42) gegenüber einem Leitmittelteil (22) auslösbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/06; B65H 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/00 (2006.01); B65H 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/0086 (2013.01); B65H 35/002 (2013.01); B65H 35/04 (2013.01); B65H 2407/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 9207836 U1 19920827

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902047 U1 20000621; DE 19904783 A1 20000810; EP 1026113 A2 20000809; EP 1026113 A3 20020410

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1026409

2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030826

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021129

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB NL

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI