Global Patent Index - EP 1026225 A1

EP 1026225 A1 2000-08-09 - Electrical and transformer oil composition

Title (en)

Electrical and transformer oil composition

Title (de)

Oelzusammensetzung zur Anwendung in elektrischen Anlagen und Transformatoren

Title (fr)

Composition d'huile pour appareillage electrique et transformateurs

Publication

EP 1026225 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00300838 A

Priority

US 24527099 A

Abstract (en)

The composition comprises a major amount of a paraffinic oil having a Cleveland open cup flash point of more than about 200 DEG C and an effective amount of at least one hindered phenolic antioxidant and at least one tolyltriazole metal deactivator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 169/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 141/06 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2013.01); C10M 141/06 (2013.01); C10M 2203/10 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1006 (2013.01); C10M 2203/102 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1025 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/223 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/201 (2013.01); C10N 2240/202 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 141/06 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 133/44
  2. C10M 169/04 + C10M 101/02 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 133/44

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

US 6083889 A 20000704; CA 2295241 A1 20000805; DE 60002617 D1 20030618; DE 60002617 T2 20040226; EP 1026225 A1 20000809; EP 1026225 B1 20030514; SG 82061 A1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-11-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING CY (DELAWARE

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080108

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080111

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60002617 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI