Global Patent Index - EP 1026229 A1

EP 1026229 A1 2000-08-09 - Coated detergent tablet

Title (en)

Coated detergent tablet

Title (de)

Beschichtetes Reinigungsmittel in Tablettenform

Title (fr)

Comprimé détergent sous forme de tablette enrobée

Publication

EP 1026229 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870019 A

Priority

EP 99870019 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a coated detergent tablet characterised in that the coating comprises a component which is liquid at 25 DEG C.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/18; C11D 3/20; C11D 3/37; C11D 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/18 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0082 (2013.01); C11D 3/126 (2013.01); C11D 3/18 (2013.01); C11D 3/2082 (2013.01); C11D 3/2093 (2013.01); C11D 3/3707 (2013.01); C11D 3/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026229 A1 20000809; AR 022480 A1 20020904; AU 2737700 A 20000825; BR 0008004 A 20011204; CA 2360665 A1 20000810; CN 1343251 A 20020403; EP 1149153 A1 20011031; MX PA01007832 A 20020424; WO 0046340 A1 20000810

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041223

2001-06-27 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000824

2001-06-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-06-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI