Global Patent Index - EP 1026230 A1

EP 1026230 A1 2000-08-09 - A machine dishwashing kit

Title (en)

A machine dishwashing kit

Title (de)

Kit zum Reinigen von Geschirr

Title (fr)

Kit de nettoyage pour la vaisselle

Publication

EP 1026230 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00300826 A

Priority

GB 9902626 A

Abstract (en)

A mechanical dishwashing kit comprises an amount of packaged detergent composition and an amount of packaged rinse aid composition, wherein the amount of rinse aid provided is directly proportional to the amount of detergent provided. The or each of the rinse aid and the detergent are formulated to create conditions within the machine during a washing/ rinse cycle that obviate the need for a separate ion exchange regenerating salt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/124 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); C11D 17/0091 (2013.01); C11D 17/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026230 A1 20000809; AR 022520 A1 20020904; AU 2293500 A 20000825; FR 2789291 A1 20000811; FR 2789291 B3 20010420; GB 2346319 A 20000809; GB 2346319 B 20021204; GB 9902626 D0 19990331; IT 249570 Y1 20030519; IT TO20000024 U1 20010806; PT 102413 A 20000831; WO 0046341 A1 20000810

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020624

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI