Global Patent Index - EP 1026231 A1

EP 1026231 A1 2000-08-09 - Laundry bag

Title (en)

Laundry bag

Title (de)

Wäschesack

Title (fr)

Sac à linge

Publication

EP 1026231 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870164 A

Priority

  • EP 99870164 A
  • EP 99870022 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a water permeable laundry bag comprising a detergent composition. The invention also provides a process of washing laundry using a laundry bag comprising a detergent composition, whereby the laundry is inserted within at least one laundry bag in a first step, the laundry bag containing laundry being inserted in a washing machine in a second step, the wash taking place in a third step.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/04; D06F 95/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 1/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01); D06F 35/00 (2006.01); D06F 39/02 (2006.01); D06F 95/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0021 (2013.01); D06F 39/024 (2013.01); D06F 95/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026231 A1 20000809; AR 022503 A1 20020904; AU 2631500 A 20000825; EP 1149156 A1 20011031; JP 2002536092 A 20021029; WO 0046342 A1 20000810

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031111

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030228

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI