Global patent index - EP 1026270 A1

EP 1026270 A1 2000-08-09 - AlCuMg alloy product for aircraft body member

Title (en)

AlCuMg alloy product for aircraft body member

Title (de)

Produkt aus AlCuMg-Legierung für ein Zellenbauteil eines Flugzeuges

Title (fr)

Produit en alliage ALCuMg pour élément de structure d'avions

Publication

EP 1026270 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420020 A

Priority

  • FR 9901468 A
  • FR 9910682 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2346381A] Rolled, extruded or forged product made of an AlCuMg alloy processed by solution heat treatment, quenching and cold stretching, to be used in the manufacture of aircraft structural elements, with the following composition (% by weight): <DL TSIZE=11> <DT>Fe<0.15<DD>Si<0.15 Cu:3.8-4.4 Mg:1-1.5 <DT>Mn:0.5-0.8<DD>Zr:0.08-0.15 </DL> other elements: < 0.05 each and < 0.15 total with a ratio R<SB>m</SB>(L)/R<SB>0.2</SB>(L) > 1.25. The invention is particularly applicable to the manufacture of lower wings, and has a set of properties (toughness, crack propagation rate, fatigue strength, residual stress level), that are better than alloy 2024.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet un produit laminé, filé ou forgé en alliage AlCuMg, traité par mise en solution, trempe et traction à froid, destiné à la fabrication d'éléments de structure d'avion, de composition (% en poids) : Fe < 0,15 Si < 0,15 Cu : 3,8 - 4,4 Mg : 1 - 1,5 Mn : 0,5 - 0,8 Zr : 0,08 - 0,15 autres éléments : < 0,05 chacun et < 0,15 au total, reste aluminium, et présentant un rapport Rm(L)/R0,2(L) > 1,25. L'invention s'applique plus particulièrement à la fabrication d'intrados d'ailes, présentant un ensemble de propriétés (ténacité, vitesse de propagation de fissure, résistance à la fatigue, niveau de contraintes résiduelles) améliorées par rapport à l'alliage 2024.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/16; C22F 1/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/16 (2006.01); C22F 1/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/057 (2013.01); C22C 21/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026270 A1 20000809; EP 1026270 B1 20050427; DE 60019655 D1 20050602; DE 60019655 T2 20060202; FR 2789406 A1 20000811; FR 2789406 B1 20010323; GB 2346381 A 20000809; GB 9924277 D0 19991215; US 2002014288 A1 20020207; US 2003217793 A1 20031127; US 6602361 B2 20030805

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM ISSOIRE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60019655

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-05-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60019655

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20150915

2015-10-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM ISSOIRE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20150915

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM FRANCE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60019655

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM ISSOIRE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60019655

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60019655

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60019655

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60019655

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-06-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60019655

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM FRANCE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20111123

2011-04-20 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20101125

2008-06-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: ALERIS ALUMINUM KOBLENZ GMBH

- Effective date: 20060127

2007-05-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALCAN RHENALU

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-03-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH ET AL.

- Effective date: 20060127

2006-06-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-03-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH ET AL.

- Effective date: 20060127

2005-09-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60019655

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-04-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030820

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001002

2000-09-06 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI