Global Patent Index - EP 1026279 A1

EP 1026279 A1 2000-08-09 - PERMANENT MAGNETIC ALLOY WITH EXCELLENT HEAT RESISTANCE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

PERMANENT MAGNETIC ALLOY WITH EXCELLENT HEAT RESISTANCE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

PERMANENTMAGNETISCHE LEGIERUNG MIT HERVORRAGENDEN WAERMERESISTENTEN EIGENSCHAFTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE MAGNETIQUE PERMANENT PRESENTANT UNE EXCELLENTE RESISTANCE A LA CHALEUR, ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1026279 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99933132 A

Priority

  • JP 9904048 W
  • JP 22752298 A

Abstract (en)

A permanent magnet alloy having an improved beat resistance comprising, in terms of % by atom, 0.1 to 15 at.% C, 0.5 to 15 at.% B, provided that C and B in total account for 2 to 30 at.%; 40% or less Co (exclusive), 0.5 to 5 at.% in total of Dy and Tb, 8 to 20 at.% R, where R represents at least one element selected from the group consisting of Nd, Pr, Ce, La, Y, Gd, Ho, Er, and Tm; with the balance being Fe and unavoidable impurities. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/10; B22F 9/04; C22C 1/04; H01F 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 9/04 (2006.01); C22C 1/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/10 (2006.01); H01F 1/04 (2006.01); H01F 1/057 (2006.01); H01F 1/058 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/0577 (2013.01); C22C 1/0441 (2013.01); C22C 33/0278 (2013.01); C22C 38/002 (2013.01); C22C 38/005 (2013.01); C22C 38/10 (2013.01); H01F 1/057 (2013.01); H01F 41/0266 (2013.01); B22F 2998/10 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 9/04 + B22F 3/02 + B22F 3/1028
  2. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 3/1007 + B22F 2201/10
  3. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 3/1007 + B22F 3/1028
  4. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 9/08 + B22F 9/04 + B22F 3/02
  5. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 3/02 + B22F 2202/05
  6. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 3/1007 + B22F 2201/11
  7. B22F 2999/00 + C22C 33/0207 + B22F 9/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026279 A1 20000809; EP 1026279 A4 20030409; EP 1026279 B1 20051026; CN 1098368 C 20030108; CN 1274394 A 20001122; DE 69927931 D1 20051201; DE 69927931 T2 20060720; DE 69938467 D1 20080515; DE 69938467 T2 20090409; EP 1607491 A1 20051221; EP 1607491 B1 20080402; HK 1032247 A1 20030516; JP 4034936 B2 20080116; WO 0006792 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140728

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69927931

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140728

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69927931

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927931 P 20051201

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-10-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051026

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040102

2003-04-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 38/10 A

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 1/04 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22F 9/04 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01F 1/04 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01F 1/058 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01F 1/057 B

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL