Global Patent Index - EP 1026282 A3

EP 1026282 A3 2000-10-18 - Paste boriding agent

Title (en)

Paste boriding agent

Title (de)

Pastenförmiges Boriermittel

Title (fr)

Agent de boruration pateux

Publication

EP 1026282 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100550 A

Priority

DE 19904629 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026282A2] A metal boriding paste contains alkali and/or alkaline earth metal carbonate, nitrite and borate additives. A metal boriding paste, comprising a boron source (preferably boron carbide), an activator (preferably potassium fluoroborate), an inert refractory filler (preferably silicon carbide) and water, additionally contains alkali and/or alkaline earth metal carbonate, nitrite and borate additives. An Independent claim is also included for a method of producing low porosity, preferably single phase, Fe2B-containing boride layers on ferrous metal workpieces by applying the above paste and heating at 800-1100 degrees C. Preferred Features: The additives comprise (based on wt. of paste solids) 0.1-5% calcium carbonate, 0.1-2% sodium nitrite and 0.1-2% sodium tetraborate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 8/68; C23C 8/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/68 (2006.01); C23C 8/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026282 A2 20000809; EP 1026282 A3 20001018; EP 1026282 B1 20030319; AT 234946 T 20030415; BR 0000249 A 20001017; BR 0000249 B1 20090113; CA 2298046 A1 20000805; CZ 20000366 A3 20001213; CZ 295247 B6 20050615; DE 19904629 A1 20000810; DE 19904629 C2 20030821; JP 2000226647 A 20000815; JP 4360728 B2 20091111; TR 9903326 A2 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: GARTENSTRASSE 28 A, 5400 BADEN (CH)

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DURFERRIT GMBH

- Free text: DURFERRIT GMBH#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 3#68169 MANNHEIM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DURFERRIT GMBH#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 3#68169 MANNHEIM (DE)

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1026282E

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001473 P 20030424

2003-04-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DURFERRIT GMBH

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI