Global patent index - EP 1026293 A1

EP 1026293 A1 2000-08-09 - Fibre feed tube for opened fibre material

Title (en)

Fibre feed tube for opened fibre material

Title (de)

Fasereinspeisungsrohr für aufgelöstes Fasermaterial

Title (fr)

Tuyeau d'alimentation en fibres pour matériau de fibres ouvert

Publication

EP 1026293 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102330 A

Priority

EP 99102330 A

Abstract (en)

The fiber feed tube (8), to carry loosened fibers in a pressure or suction carrier air flow to a spinning station, has a curvature over a part of its length. The ratio of the direction change angle to the curvature radius (r) of the tube center line is alpha divided by r=2.5 to 3.5. The curvature radius (r) has a value of 30-40 mm, and preferably 35 mm. The direction change angle ( alpha ) is 95-105 degrees and preferably 98.8 degrees . In the curved section, the inner diameter. of the fiber feed tube (8) reduces steadily from 8 mm to 6 mm.

Abstract (de)

Ein Fasereinspeisungsrohr (8) für mittels Druck- oder Saugluftströmung durch das Rohr gefördertes aufgelöstes Fasermaterial, welches über seine Länge eine von einer Geraden abweichende Form hat, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das Fasereinspeisungsrohr (8) über einen Teil seiner Länge einer Kreiskrümmung folgt, und daß der Richtungsänderungswinkel zum Krümmungsradius (r) der Rohrmittellinie in einem Verhältnis von (/r) = 2,5 - 3,5 steht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/30 (2006.01); D01H 4/38 (2006.01); D01H 7/86 (2006.01); D01H 7/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/90 (2013.01); D01H 4/30 (2013.01); D01H 4/38 (2013.01); D01H 7/86 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026293 A1 20000809

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-31 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020606

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI