Global Patent Index - EP 1026294 A1

EP 1026294 A1 2000-08-09 - Method of making a yarn

Title (en)

Method of making a yarn

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Garns

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la production d'un fil

Publication

EP 1026294 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101270 A

Priority

DE 19904191 A

Abstract (en)

A yarn is made by knitting it into a fabric, preferably using a base yarn (2) of wool or cotton plied with an elastic yarn (3), setting it to fix the looped form, and then de-knitting it. The yarn is finally knitted into textile goods, especially the sole and toe regions of socks.

Abstract (de)

Zur Herstellung eines Garns, welches einem Textilteil einen höheren Tragekomfort verleiht, wird ein Verfahren vorgeschlagen, bei dem aus einem Garn (1) ein Gestrick ausgebildet und dieses Gestrick einer Behandlung unterzogen wird, durch die dem Garn (1) durch die Maschen des Gestricks verliehene Bogigkeit fixiert wird. Nach der Fixierung wird das Garn (1) wieder aufgezogen. Das Garn weist einen Grundfaden (2) und einen elastischen Faden (3) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/14 (2006.01); D02G 1/00 (2006.01); D02G 3/04 (2006.01); D02G 3/32 (2006.01); D02G 3/38 (2006.01); D04B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/002 (2013.01); D02G 3/328 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026294 A1 20000809; EP 1026294 B1 20051214; DE 19904191 A1 20000810; DE 50011835 D1 20060119; JP 2000226743 A 20000815; JP 4377504 B2 20091202; US 6301759 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50011835

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2009-01-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-01-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-05-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-11-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011835

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-01-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-01-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-12-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040128

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FALKE KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010206

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI