Global Patent Index - EP 1026298 A2

EP 1026298 A2 2000-08-09 - Weaving loom with shuttle having an improved transport system

Title (en)

Weaving loom with shuttle having an improved transport system

Title (de)

Schützenwebmaschine mit verbessertem Transportsystem

Title (fr)

Métier à tisser à navette avec système de transport amélioré

Publication

EP 1026298 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00100138 A

Priority

IT MI990186 A

Abstract (en)

A weaving loom (1) with shuttles (8) having an improved transport system, whose particularity consists of the fact that it comprises at least one shuttle (8) which is suitable to perform a translatory motion through the warp threads of the loom, the at least one shuttle being actuated with a propelling movement by motorized means (9) which allow to propel the shuttle (8) from one end of the loom to the other, in order to successively accommodate the shuttle from a drop box (6) located at one end of the loom to a drop box (6) located at the opposite end. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 49/44; D03D 43/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 43/04 (2006.01); D03D 49/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 43/04 (2013.01); D03D 49/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026298 A2 20000809; EP 1026298 A3 20000927; IT 1307738 B1 20011119; IT MI990186 A1 20000801

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030417

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI