Global Patent Index - EP 1026304 A2

EP 1026304 A2 2000-08-09 - Mechanism for operating a sliding plate blocking a handle of a door of a household appliance, by means of a bowden dontrol cable

Title (en)

Mechanism for operating a sliding plate blocking a handle of a door of a household appliance, by means of a bowden dontrol cable

Title (de)

Betätigungsvorrichtung einer Schieberplatte zum Verriegeln des Türgriffes eines Haushaltgerätes mit einem Bowdenzug

Title (fr)

Mecanisme pour actionner une plaque coulissante bloquant la poignée de porte d'un appareil domestique par le moyen d'un cable de commande type ''bowden''

Publication

EP 1026304 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00101647 A

Priority

SI 9900019 A

Abstract (en)

From a machine actuation mechanism to a mechanism for moving a sliding plate (2) a Bowden control cable (3) is carried, whose conduit (32) leans against a supporting attachment (11) of a mounting plate (1), a wire (31) of the Bowden control cable (3) being fastened to a pushing plate (4). The pushing plate (4) is guided by the mounting plate (1) and, in a pushing way, leans against a first arm of a bent lever (5), a second arm whereof, in a pushing way, leans against a supporting attachment (21) of the sliding blocking plate (2), which, when pulled by the Bowden control cable (3), disengages the door handle of the appliance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026304 A2 20000809; EP 1026304 A3 20010816; SI 20164 A 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-06-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI