Global Patent Index - EP 1026305 A2

EP 1026305 A2 2000-08-09 - Laundry drier with a gas heating device

Title (en)

Laundry drier with a gas heating device

Title (de)

Wäschetrockner mit einer gasbeheizten Heizungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Sèche-linge avec dispositif de chauffage au gaz

Publication

EP 1026305 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103051 A

Priority

  • DE 19530627 A
  • EP 96710012 A

Abstract (en)

The laundry dryer has a drum, a fan and a gas-heated heater to heat the process air current by means of a burner (5). The gas is blended with prim. air as combustion air before the burner(5), which is a pre-mixing burner without additional supply of sec. air to the burner surface. The burner (5) is preceded a mixing chamber (11) with a gas nozzle (12) that extends into the mixing chamber (11) and with at least one prim. air supply opening (13) with a constant cross-section, and at least one additional prim. air supply opening (13') with an adjustable cross-section.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wäschetrockner mit einer Trommel zur Aufnahme von zu trocknender Wäsche, mit einem Gebläse zur Erzeugung eines durch die Trommel geleiteten Prozeßluftstromes, mit einer gasbeheizten Heizungseinrichtung zur Erwärmung des Prozeßluftstromes durch einen Gasbrenner und einer Programmsteuereinrichtung welche ein Steuerteil und ein Leistungsteil aufweist, sowie mit einer Überwachungseinrichtung für den Zündvorgang und die Flammbildung eines Gasbrenners. Um einen handelsüblichen Haushalt-Ablufttrockner unter Einhaltung der geltenden Sicherheitsvorschriften an gasbeheizten Betrieb anzupassen, ist ein Gasfeuerungsautomat für die Steuerung des Gasventils an den Signalausgang der Heizung angekoppelt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/263 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19633505 A1 19970227; EP 0761863 A1 19970312; EP 0761863 B1 20020206; EP 1026305 A2 20000809; EP 1026305 A3 20020502; EP 1026305 A9 20020703; ES 2172650 T3 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040609

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIELE & CIE. KG

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020711

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JORDING, WOLFHARD

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RIEDEL, WIEBKE

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RODEFELD, GERHARD

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHROEDER, HANS-CHRISTOPH

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VARTMANN, THOMAS

2000-08-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 761863

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI