Global Patent Index - EP 1026309 A3

EP 1026309 A3 2000-11-02 - Flame retardant fibre

Title (en)

Flame retardant fibre

Title (de)

Feuerhemmende Faser

Title (fr)

Fibre ignifugée

Publication

EP 1026309 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00300746 A

Priority

GB 9902517 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1026309A2] In a method for producing a flame retardant polymeric fibre which includes or is treated to include carboxylic acid groups or monovalent salts thereof, the fibre is immersed in water which is neutralised by the addition of acid to pH6-pH7 and the fibre is then subsequently reacted with an aqueous solution of an amphoteric metal salt. The treatment may also be applied to fabric or garments formed from polymeric fibre which includes or is treated to include carboxylic acid groups or monovalent salts thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 11/56; D06M 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 11/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 11/56 (2013.01); D06M 2101/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XD] GB 1459309 A 19761222 - MITSUBISHI RAYON CO
  • [X] FR 2392040 A1 19781222 - BAYER AG [DE]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 280 (C - 0729) 18 June 1990 (1990-06-18)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 280 (C - 0729) 18 June 1990 (1990-06-18)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026309 A2 20000809; EP 1026309 A3 20001102; GB 9902517 D0 19990324

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040413

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-10-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACORDIS SPECIALITY FIBRES LIMITED

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE FR GB

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010430

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 06M 11/56 A, 7D 06M 11/00 B, 7D 06M 101:28 Z

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI